Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Selby Spence

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Titular Bishop of Aggersel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1909Born
5 Dec 193324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
15 Nov 194738.4IncardinatedPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
17 Mar 196454.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
17 Mar 196454.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aggersel
19 May 196455.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aggersel
7 Mar 197363.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

MicroData Summary for John Selby Spence
Bishop John Selby Spence (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Washington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, MD, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • opd: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast