Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Michael Watson

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Erie, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1908BornErie
10 May 193425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
17 May 196556.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
17 May 196556.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nationa
29 Jun 196556.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nationa
17 Mar 196960.6AppointedBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
16 Jul 198274.0RetiredBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
4 Jan 199081.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Alfred Michael Watson:
Bishop Alfred Michael Watson (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Erie

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015