Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Edward Brennan

Bishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1947 Born
15 May 197629.2Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
5 Dec 201669.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
5 Dec 201669.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
19 Jan 201769.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
23 Jul 201972.4AppointedBishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA
22 Aug 201972.5InstalledBishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Mark Edward Brennan
Bishop Mark Edward Brennan (born ) Bishop of Wheeling-Charleston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained BishopMary Our Queen, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wheeling-Charleston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 5 Dec 2016
  • c134: CB, 14 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,320
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast