Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward John Herrmann

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Columbus, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1913Born
12 Jun 194733.5Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore-Washington, Maryland, USA
15 Nov 194734.0IncardinatedPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
4 Mar 196652.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
4 Mar 196652.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamzella
26 Apr 196652.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamzella
22 Jun 197359.6AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
21 Aug 197359.7InstalledBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
18 Sep 198268.8ResignedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
22 Dec 199986.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Columbus, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward John Herrmann
Bishop Edward John Herrmann (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Columbus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, MD, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained PriestBaltimore, MD, Archdiocese of Baltimore-Washington, Maryland

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast