Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard William Schmitt

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1928BornWheeling
28 May 195526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
27 May 198859.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA
27 May 198859.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Walla Walla
1 Aug 198860.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Walla Walla
29 Mar 198960.6AppointedBishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA
9 Dec 200476.3RetiredBishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA
16 Aug 201183.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard William Schmitt:
Bishop Bernard William Schmitt (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wheeling-Charleston

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,730
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013