Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Joseph Harrington

Bishop Emeritus of Winona, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1933 BornDetroit
6 Jun 195925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
23 Nov 199360.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
23 Nov 199360.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzalis
6 Jan 199460.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzalis
4 Nov 199865.2AppointedBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
6 Jan 199965.3InstalledBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
7 May 200975.7RetiredBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard Joseph Harrington:
Bishop Bernard Joseph Harrington (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Winona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Winona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,198

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013