Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick Francis Campbell

Bishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1943 Born
31 May 198036.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
2 Mar 199955.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
2 Mar 199955.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Afufenia
14 May 199955.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Afufenia
14 Oct 200461.1AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
13 Jan 200561.4InstalledBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Frederick Francis Campbell
Bishop Frederick Francis Campbell (born ) Bishop of Columbus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElmira, NY

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Columbus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,552

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018