Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Anthony Welch

Deceased

Bishop of Duluth, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1884BornFaribault, MN
11 Jun 190924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
14 Dec 192541.1AppointedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
3 Feb 192641.3Ordained BishopBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
9 Sep 195974.9DiedBishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Anthony Welch:
Bishop Thomas Anthony Welch (born , died ) Bishop of Duluth

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013