Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Alexander Glenn

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crookston, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1900BornBellingham, WA
11 Jun 192726.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 195655.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Duluth, Minnesota, USA
13 Jul 195655.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
12 Sep 195656.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
27 Jan 196059.4AppointedBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
24 Jul 197069.9ResignedBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
24 Jul 197069.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Blera
31 Dec 197070.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Blera
26 Jan 198584.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Crookston, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Alexander Glenn:
Bishop Lawrence Alexander Glenn (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crookston

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013