Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Martin Kelly

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Winona, Minnesota

Titular Bishop of Nasai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1886BornHouston, MN
1 Nov 191225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Winona, Minnesota, USA
22 Mar 192639.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
22 Mar 192639.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mylasa
9 Jun 192639.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mylasa
10 Feb 192841.2AppointedBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
17 Oct 194962.9ResignedBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
17 Oct 194962.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
24 Jun 195063.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Winona, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Martin Kelly:
Bishop Francis Martin Kelly (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Winona

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015