Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignaz Rieder

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1858BornGrossarl (Gro▀arl)
17 Jul 188123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
2 Jan 191152.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
2 Jan 191152.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
19 Mar 191153.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
12 Aug 191860.5SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
7 Oct 191860.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
15 Dec 191860.8InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
8 Oct 193476.6DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ignaz Rieder:
Archbishop Ignaz Rieder (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1911, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015