Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Baptist Filzer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

Titular Bishop of Bararus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1874BornKitzbŘhel
19 Jul 189622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
18 Feb 192753.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
18 Feb 192753.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bararus
20 Mar 192753.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bararus
13 Jul 196288.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptist Filzer:
Bishop Johannes Baptist Filzer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1927, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013