Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Ignaz Maximilian Stepišnik (Stepischnegg)

Deceased

Bishop of Lavant, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1815Born
2 Aug 183823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lavant, Slovenia
21 Dec 186247.4AppointedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
18 Jan 186347.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lavant, Slovenia
28 Jun 188973.9DiedBishop of Lavant, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Jakob Ignaz Maximilian Stepišnik (Stepischnegg) (VIAF: 66845629)
Bishop Jakob Ignaz Maximilian Stepišnik (Stepischnegg) (born , died ) Bishop of Lavant

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCelje
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1863, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017