Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottokar Maria von Attems

Deceased

Bishop of Seckau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1815Born
22 Aug 183722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Seckau, Austria
10 Sep 185338.5SelectedBishop of Seckau, Austria
5 Nov 185338.7ConfirmedBishop of Seckau, Austria
6 Nov 185338.7Ordained BishopBishop of Seckau, Austria
12 Apr 186752.1DiedBishop of Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ottokar Maria von Attems (VIAF: 306365747)
Bishop Ottokar Maria von Attems (born , died ) Bishop of Seckau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 508
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,853, Number 49
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast