Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Funder

Deceased

Bishop of Gurk, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1820Born
31 Jul 184423.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gurk, Austria
30 Mar 188160.4SelectedBishop of Gurk, Austria
13 May 188160.5ConfirmedBishop of Gurk, Austria
26 Jun 188160.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
2 Oct 188665.9DiedBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Peter Funder
Bishop Peter Funder (born , died ) Bishop of Gurk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaisach
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1881, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017