Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo Maria d’Ambrogi, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1833Born
18 Oct 185017.7ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
22 Dec 185522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
18 Mar 189562.1AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
28 Apr 189562.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
Nov 1895³62.7ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
23 Nov 189562.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Maria d’Ambrogi
Bishop Guglielmo Maria d’Ambrogi O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 553
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1895, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017