Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola (Francisco Saverio) Contieri, O.Bas. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gaeta, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Pharsalus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1827Born
21 Sep 185023.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 187648.8AppointedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
7 May 187648.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
Dec 1891²64.4ResignedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
14 Dec 189164.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
26 Apr 189971.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola (Francisco Saverio) Contieri (VIAF: 88747059)
Archbishop Nicola (Francisco Saverio) Contieri O.Bas. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBari
Ordained BishopSt. Mary Major, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 169, and Page 451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1876, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017