Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Macarone-Palmieri

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1817Born
21 Sep 183922.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 187760.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Termoli, Italy
12 Mar 187760.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
18 Mar 187760.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
28 Feb 187962.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Boiano, Italy
19 Mar 187962.1SucceededBishop of Boiano, Italy
27 Feb 189780.0DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Macarone-Palmieri (VIAF: 316421989)
Bishop Francesco Macarone-Palmieri (born , died ) Bishop of Boiano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarinola
Ordained BishopS. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1888
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 151, and Page 548
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 549
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Mar 2017