Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giacomo Gregorio Gallo

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1807Born
7 Apr 183225.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 187871.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
25 Jul 187871.3Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
24 Nov 188174.6DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Gregorio Gallo
Patriarch Giacomo Gregorio Gallo (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsimo, Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017