Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Piterà

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bova, Italy

Titular Bishop of Auzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1823Born
7 Mar 184622.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187148.5AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
25 Feb 187248.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
29 May 187652.9ResignedBishop of Bova, Italy
20 Mar 187753.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
10 May 191389.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Piterà
Bishop Antonio Piterà (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCutro, Diocese of San Severino (Marche)
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 133, and Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast