Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Gagliardi

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1814Born
14 Apr 183824.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187258.0AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
25 Feb 187258.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
18 Aug 188066.5DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Gagliardi
Bishop Raffaele Gagliardi (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrimaldi, Archdiocese of Cosenza
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1872, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017