Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Spinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1824Born
22 Sep 184925.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 187450.0AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
21 Jun 187450.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
14 Nov 188359.4DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Spinelli (VIAF: 89210079)
Bishop Giuseppe Spinelli (born , died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopLazaristes in Montecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 168
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1874, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017