Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Cione

Deceased

Bishop of Policastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1826Born
24 Mar 184923.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187246.1AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
25 Feb 187246.1Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
7 Sep 1898³72.6DiedBishop of Policastro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Cione
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Cione (born , died ) Bishop of Policastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnoli Irpino, Diocese of Nusco
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 461
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1872, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017