Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Corsani

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1813Born
1838¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jun 187460.5AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
21 Jun 187460.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
11 Feb 188874.1DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Corsani
Bishop Luigi Corsani (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrato
Ordained BishopLazaristes in Montecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 270
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1874, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017