Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcello Mazzanti

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1831Born
22 Dec 185524.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 187645.6AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
5 Nov 187645.7Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
27 Mar 188554.1AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
18 Aug 190877.5DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Mazzanti (VIAF: 89230786)
Bishop Marcello Mazzanti (born , died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpianate, Diocese of Pescia
Ordained BishopSte Marie des fleurs, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 214, and Page 457
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017