Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinando Capponi

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1835BornFirenze
19 Dec 185722.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Dec 185823.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 187338.3AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
27 Jul 187338.3Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
18 Nov 188146.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Pisa, Italy
18 Nov 188146.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
8 Mar 188347.9SucceededArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
21 Mar 190368.0DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Capponi:
Archbishop Ferdinando Capponi (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 455, and Page 550
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 595

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013