Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anastasio Laterza, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1820Born
10 Jun 184322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
22 Dec 187151.1AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
27 Dec 187151.1Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
19 Mar 187958.3DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Anastasio Laterza
Bishop Anastasio Laterza O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Boiano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePutignano, Diocese of Conversano
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 151
  • qoca: CB, 6 Mar 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1871, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017