Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Positano

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1816Born
13 Jun 184023.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 187356.2AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
23 Mar 187356.3Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
13 May 188063.4DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Positano
Bishop Mariano Positano (born , died ) Bishop of Castellaneta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 190
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,745
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1873, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018