Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rambaldo Magagnini

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1807Born
19 Sep 182922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Jesi, Italy
6 May 187265.1AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
26 May 187265.2Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
23 Dec 189285.7DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rambaldo Magagnini (VIAF: 89173236)
Bishop Rambaldo Magagnini (born , died ) Bishop of Jesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJesi, Diocese of Jesi
Ordained BishopSanta Francesca Romana, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 79
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,740
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1872, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017