Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Ramaschiello

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1813³Born
20 May 183723.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187158.1AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
27 Dec 187158.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
22 Jan 189985.2DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Ramaschiello
Bishop Domenico Ramaschiello (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNocera dei Pagani, Diocese of Nocera de’ Pagani
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1871, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017