Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Maria Villa

Deceased

Bishop of Parma, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1818Born
1 Apr 184324.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187253.3AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
25 Feb 187253.3Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
22 Jul 188263.8DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria Villa (VIAF: 18066159)
Bishop Domenico Maria Villa (born , died ) Bishop of Parma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBassano, Diocese of Vicenza
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 442
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,872, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast