Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Cotellessa

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1820Born
20 Sep 184524.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187251.2AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
25 Feb 187251.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
22 May 188968.5DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Cotellessa (VIAF: 88764330)
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Cotellessa (born , died ) Bishop of Lucera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLanciano, Archdiocese of Lanciano
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 351
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1872, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017