Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Maria Basile, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1826Born
25 Mar 184619.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Mar 185225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Dec 187145.3AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
27 Dec 187145.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
24 Jun 188356.8DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Maria Basile (VIAF: 257793478)
Bishop Alessandro Maria Basile C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIschitella, Archdiocese of Manfredonia (e Vieste)
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 31.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 188
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1871, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017