Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tobia Patroni

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1818Born
18 Sep 184122.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187152.9AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
27 Dec 187153.0Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
20 Aug 190687.6DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tobia Patroni (VIAF: 89305605)
Bishop Tobia Patroni (born , died ) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnoli Irpino, Diocese of Nusco
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 581
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1871, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017