Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Maria Galdi

Deceased

Bishop of Andria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1823Born
26 Oct 184522.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187249.0AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
25 Feb 187249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
9 Mar 189976.1DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Maria Galdi (VIAF: 88883155)
Bishop Federico Maria Galdi (born , died ) Bishop of Andria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOgliara, Archdiocese of Salerno (-Acerno)
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1872, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017