Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Pfluger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

Titular Archbishop of Macra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1857BornRaab
24 Jul 188124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Nov 191154.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
30 Nov 191154.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Harpasa
17 Dec 191154.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Harpasa
29 Jan 192769.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Macra
10 Jan 192971.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Joseph Pfluger:
Archbishop Joseph Pfluger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015