Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Karl Heinrich Braunstorfer, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Order of Cistercians

Titular See: (Austrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1895Born
23 Aug 191520.3ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
8 Sep 191823.3Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Cistercians
15 Sep 191823.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Cistercians
24 Feb 191923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
9 Aug 194550.2AppointedAbbot of Order of Cistercians
14 Sep 196974.3ResignedAbbot of Order of Cistercians
20 Sep 197883.3DiedAbbot Emeritus of Order of Cistercians

MicroData Summary for Karl Heinrich Braunstorfer
Abbot Karl Heinrich Braunstorfer O. Cist. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Order of Cistercians

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKatzelsdorf

  • a priest for 59.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 7 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018