Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Celestino Endrici

Deceased

Archbishop of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1866BornDon
28 Oct 189125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
31 Jan 190437.8SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
6 Feb 190437.8ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
13 Mar 190437.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
19 Mar 190438.0InstalledBishop of Trento, Italy
14 Jun 192963.2AppointedArchbishop of Trento, Italy
29 Oct 194074.6DiedArchbishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Celestino Endrici:
Archbishop Celestino Endrici (born , died ) Archbishop of Trento

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1904, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015