Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Robles

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹BornLille
6 Jul 165459.5AppointedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
11 Oct 165459.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
18 May 165964.3DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Robles:
Bishop François de Robles (died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015