Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karel van den Bosch

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1597BornBruxelles
1 Apr 162325.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 165052.6SelectedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
17 Apr 165052.9ConfirmedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
23 Jul 165154.1Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
15 Mar 165860.8SelectedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
15 Mar 166062.8ConfirmedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
5 Apr 166567.8DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Karel van den Bosch:
Bishop Karel van den Bosch (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 122, and Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015