Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean de Wachtendonck

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Feb 1592³BornMalines
2 Oct 165462.6AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
13 Dec 165462.8Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
2 Jun 166775.3SelectedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
12 Mar 166876.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
23 Jun 166876.3DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Wachtendonck:
Archbishop Jean de Wachtendonck (died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 261
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 251, and Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015