Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Van Halmaele

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1625Born
6 Apr 165025.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 167146.7SelectedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
12 Sep 167247.5ConfirmedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
28 Oct 167247.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
19 Apr 167550.1DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

MicroData Summary for Henri Van Halmaele
Bishop Henri Van Halmaele (born , died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnvers

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,672, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast