Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozafat Micheł Karp

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1679³Born
13 Aug 171940.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Aug 171940.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 173657.5AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
7 Feb 173757.7Ordained BishopBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
10 Dec 173960.5DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jozafat Micheł Karp
Bishop Jozafat Micheł Karp (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzaulen, Diocese of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)
Ordained BishopVilnius, Diocese of Vilnius

  • a priest for 20.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 2
  • mn: JI, 1 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,098
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,977
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,821

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast