Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Ancaiani

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1684³BornSpoleto
15 Nov 173955.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 173955.5AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
30 Nov 173955.5Ordained BishopBishop of Spoleto, Italy
8 Mar 174358.8DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Ancaiani:
Bishop Ludovico Ancaiani (born , died ) Bishop of Spoleto

  • a priest for 3.3 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015