Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Ernestus von Harrach

Deceased

Bishop of Nitra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1705³BornWien, Austria
29 Mar 173327.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Apr 173327.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 173731.9SelectedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
30 Sep 173732.4ConfirmedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
6 Oct 173732.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nitra, Slovakia
16 Dec 173934.6DiedBishop of Nitra, Slovakia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Ernestus von Harrach:
Bishop Joannes Ernestus von Harrach (born , died ) Bishop of Nitra

  • a priest for 6.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015