Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel (a S. Iosepho) Valejo Berlanga, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1682Born
19 Jan 175067.3AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
25 Jan 175067.3Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
17 May 175774.6DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel (a S. Iosepho) Valejo Berlanga
Bishop Miguel (a S. Iosepho) Valejo Berlanga O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 68, Number 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast