Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco de Simone

Deceased

Bishop of Troia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1704Born
20 Dec 172723.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 175248.0AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
23 Jul 175248.0Ordained BishopBishop of Troia, Italy
24 Feb 177772.6DiedBishop of Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco de Simone
Bishop Marco de Simone (born , died ) Bishop of Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Elpidio

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,752, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast