Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Umberto Luigi Radicati de Cocconato

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1697³BornMotilgio
25 May 172022.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 173941.5AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
1 Mar 173941.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
13 Nov 177376.3DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Umberto Luigi Radicati de Cocconato:
Bishop Umberto Luigi Radicati de Cocconato (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015