Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Saverio Mastrilli, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1699BornTufino
8 Dec 171516.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
15 Nov 172222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
3 Jul 175959.5SelectedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
13 Jul 175959.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
15 Jul 175959.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
Oct 1777³77.8DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Mastrilli:
Archbishop Francesco Saverio Mastrilli C.R. (born , died Oct 1777) Archbishop of Taranto

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015