Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Maria Cardinal Priuli

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1707BornAt Sea (on the way to Venezia)
8 Sep 173023.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Sep 173023.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 173831.3AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
18 Jan 173931.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
2 Oct 175851.1Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jul 175951.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
19 Apr 176254.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
6 Apr 176759.6AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
26 Oct 177265.1DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Priuli:
Antonio Maria Cardinal Priuli (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
  • a cardinal for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1758
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015